MD SB140 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1036
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 452
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 452
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain employers of commercial motor vehicle drivers to provide the U.S. Department of Transportation number of any entity currently owned by the employer and website address for the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration's Safety and Fitness Records (SAFER) System to a prospective employee driver on a bona fide offer of employment; and providing certain civil penalties.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Commercial Motor Carriers - Safety, Inspection, Performance, and Insurance Information (James Cohran's Law)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 452 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-10-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1036 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB1074 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 451
HB1074 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 451
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Disclosure
Federal Government
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Safety
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Work, Labor, and Employment
Disclosure
Federal Government
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Safety
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 16 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 16 | 806 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |