MD SB141 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 214
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 214
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Raising the salaries of part-time inspectors employed by the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County from $10,000 to $11,000 for one part-time chief inspector, from $8,000 to $9,000 for one part-time deputy chief inspector, and for other part-time inspectors from $6,000 to $7,000 annually.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Salaries of Inspectors
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] | Sen. Bryan Simonaire [R] | Sen. Edward Reilly [R] |
Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 214 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB461 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 213
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Anne Arundel County
Inspections
License Commissioners, Boards of
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Anne Arundel County
Inspections
License Commissioners, Boards of
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |