MD SB142 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that a specified notice of tax sale of property in Anne Arundel County be published in two newspapers published in the county; and requiring the notice to be published on the county's Web site.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Tax Sale Advertising
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Advertising
Anne Arundel County
Electronic Government
Local Government Mandates
News Media
Notices
Personal Property
Real Property
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property - Local
Anne Arundel County
Electronic Government
Local Government Mandates
News Media
Notices
Personal Property
Real Property
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property - Local