MD SB146 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Secretary of Juvenile Services to appoint an additional deputy secretary as necessary under certain circumstances.
Title
Department of Juvenile Services – Deputy Secretaries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2021-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Human Services | 9 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |