MD SB149 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person who undertakes the towing or removal of a vehicle from a parking lot to notify the insurer of record electronically if that form of notice is agreed to by the tower and the insurer of record in a certain manner.
Title
Vehicle Towing or Removal – Insurer of Record – Electronic Notification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2024-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-27 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB176 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 10A-04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |