MD SB16 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an employer from requiring an individual to work during a specified time period on a day in which the individual is expected to perform jury service or acts related to jury service or on a day after the individual performs jury service or acts related to jury service; and prohibiting an employer from depriving an individual of employment or coercing, intimidating, or threatening to discharge an individual for exercising a specified right to refrain from work for performing jury service or acts relating to jury service.
Title
Jury Service - Employers - Prohibited Acts
Sponsors
Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Thomas Miller [D] | Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] |
Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Committee Amendment Adopted (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Committee Amendment Adopted (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (95-40) | |
2012-03-28 | Special Order until 4/3 (Delegate W. Miller) Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments 442118/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2012-03-16 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-14 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2012-03-30 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (28-18) | |
2012-03-30 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2012-02-13 | Third Reading Passed (26-20) | |
2012-02-09 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2012-02-09 | Committee Amendment Adopted (28-18) | |
2012-02-09 | Favorable with Amendments 508779/1 | |
2012-02-08 | Laid Over (Senator Kittleman) Adopted | |
2012-02-08 | Favorable with Amendments 508779/1 | |
2012-02-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-01-10 | Hearing 1/12 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-11 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-10-17 | Pre-filed |