MD SB16 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creating in Anne Arundel County a refillable container license; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the license to a holder of a Class A license, a Class B license, or a Class D license; specifying that a holder of the license may sell draft beer for consumption off the licensed premises in a specified refillable container; requiring a refillable container to meet specified requirements; requiring an applicant for the license to complete a form and pay a fee; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2013-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0) |
2013-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {953898/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2013-02-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {944130/1 Report Adopted |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2012-10-12 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Advertising
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Anne Arundel County
Beverage Containers
Fees
Forms
Hearings
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Rules and Regulations
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Anne Arundel County
Beverage Containers
Fees
Forms
Hearings
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Rules and Regulations