MD SB16 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB335
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain private entities in possession of biometric identifiers or biometric information to develop a written policy, made available to the public, establishing a certain retention schedule and guidelines for permanently destroying biometric identifiers and biometric information; prohibiting a private entity from being required to make publicly available a certain policy; requiring each private entity in possession of biometric identifiers or biometric information to comply with certain schedules and guidelines; etc.
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-09-28 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB16 (Carry Over) 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
HB218 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-25 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
HB218 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-25 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Biometrics
Chemical Tests
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Damages
Data
Demographics
Disclosure
Drivers' Licenses
Ethics
Fines
Fingerprinting
Genetics
Health
Health Insurance
Identification
Negligence
Photography
Privacy
Safety
Signatures
Subpoenas
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Warrants
Weights and Measures
Biometrics
Chemical Tests
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Damages
Data
Demographics
Disclosure
Drivers' Licenses
Ethics
Fines
Fingerprinting
Genetics
Health
Health Insurance
Identification
Negligence
Photography
Privacy
Safety
Signatures
Subpoenas
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Warrants
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 14 | 4301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0016?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0016f.pdf |