MD SB17 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB168
Note: Carry Foward to future HB221
Note: Carry Foward to future SB552
Note: Carry Foward to future HB221
Note: Carry Foward to future SB552
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-17 - Hearing 1/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-17 - Hearing 1/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an insurer, with respect to private passenger motor vehicle insurance, from rating a risk based, in whole or in part, on the credit history of an applicant or insured in any manner; repealing certain provisions of law authorizing an insurer to use the credit history of an applicant or insured to rate a new policy of private passenger motor vehicle insurance; applying the Act to all private passenger motor vehicle insurance policies issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after October 1, 2020; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 2:45 p.m. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB17 (Carry Over) 2020-01-17 - Hearing 1/29 at 2:45 p.m.
SB17 (Carry Over) 2020-01-17 - Hearing 1/29 at 2:45 p.m.
SB17 (Carry Over) 2020-01-17 - Hearing 1/29 at 2:45 p.m.
SB17 (Carry Over) 2020-01-17 - Hearing 1/29 at 2:45 p.m.
SB17 (Carry Over) 2020-01-17 - Hearing 1/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0017?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0017f.pdf |