MD SB17 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-04 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-04 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that each domestic or farm animal harmed in a violation of a prohibition against animal cruelty is a separate offense and shall be deemed an individual victim for purposes of the sentencing guidelines stacking rule; and establishing that a conviction for a crime relating to animals may not merge with a conviction for any other crime based on the act establishing the violation and that a sentence imposed may be separate from and consecutive to or concurrent with a sentence based on the act establishing a violation.
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Relating to Animals - Conviction and Sentencing
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {213126/1 Adopted |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment {653925/1 (Senator Bailey) Adopted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {183726/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator West) Adopted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {183726/1 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator West) Adopted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {183726/1 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2023-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB667 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-05 - Referred Rules
Subjects
Abuse
Animals
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Domestic Animals
Livestock
Penalties and Sentences
Victims
Animals
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Domestic Animals
Livestock
Penalties and Sentences
Victims
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 10 | 627 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |