MD SB172 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a restaurant in Kent County to have average daily receipts from the sale of food that are at least 25% of the total average daily receipts of the restaurant; requiring certain restaurants in Kent County to be equipped with an indoor, outdoor, or combination indoor and outdoor dining area and certain facilities; repealing the Kent County beer or wine tasting (BWT) license and establishing a beer, wine, and liquor tasting (BWLT) license; establishing a $200 fee for a BWLT license in addition to the fees for any other license; etc.
Title
Kent County – Alcoholic Beverages – Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-26 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2018-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-23 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-23 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {564237/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
Food
Kent County
Restaurants
Revenue and Taxes
Weights and Measures
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
Food
Kent County
Restaurants
Revenue and Taxes
Weights and Measures