MD SB184 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Public Service Commission to require each electric company to procure or provide specified energy efficiency and conservation programs and services to its electricity customers on a specified savings trajectory for the duration of the 2018-2020 and 2021-2023 program cycles; establishing a baseline for the savings trajectory; requiring that specified nonenergy benefits be quantifiable and directly related to a specified program or service; etc.
Title
Energy Efficiency Programs - Calculation of Program Savings and Consideration of Cost-Effectiveness
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] | Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] |
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Jim Mathias [D] | Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-44) (Y: 93 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {873626/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-33) (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {873626/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-33) (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 14 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-44) |
2017-03-24 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-14) |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Floor Amendment {873626/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-33) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Benson) Withdrawn |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Floor Amendment {873626/1 (Senator Hershey) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {377075/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {377075/1 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Conservation
Energy Matters
Procurement
Public Service Commission
Retail Sales
Utility Regulation
Conservation
Energy Matters
Procurement
Public Service Commission
Retail Sales
Utility Regulation