MD SB184 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-14)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-14)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the determination of the number of exemptions that an individual may use to calculate a certain deduction under the Maryland income tax; requiring the Bureau of Revenue Estimates, in consultation with the Consensus Revenue Monitoring and Forecasting Group, to review and update a certain report relating to certain federal tax changes and to include certain information in the updated report; requiring the Bureau to submit the updated report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 15, 2018; and applying the Act.
Title
Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Alteration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {513129/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {513129/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {695765/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Floor Amendment {513129/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted (47-0) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Special Order until 2/2 (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Favorable |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |