MD SB187 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers and Home Inspectors in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act by extending to July 1, 2023, the termination date; renaming the Commission; requiring that an evaluation of the Commission be performed by July 1, 2022; repealing a requirement for the Commission to submit a specified report to specified committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2002; requiring the Commission to submit specified reports; etc.
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers and Home Inspectors - Sunset
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments 723195/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-03-26 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-03-06 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2012-03-31 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2012-03-31 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2012-02-09 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-07 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-06 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2012-01-20 | Hearing 2/1 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-20 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Appraisals
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Housing
Inspections
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Names
Real Estate
Reports
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Housing
Inspections
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Names
Real Estate
Reports
Sunset