MD SB19 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Highway Administration to issue permits for specified vehicles carrying specified products and loads of specified maximum weights to operate in specified areas in specified circumstances and subject to specified conditions; expanding the scope of a permitting process for vehicles that carry specified forest products to include vehicles that carry specified farm products; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Exceptional Hauling Permits - Farm Products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-03 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) | |
2011-04-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-28 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-22 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2011-04-04 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Senate Concur - House Amendment | |
2011-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-01-20 | Hearing 2/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-17 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Agriculture
Fees
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Licenses
Milk Products
Motor Vehicles
Records
Transportation
Trucks
Weights and Measures
Fees
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Licenses
Milk Products
Motor Vehicles
Records
Transportation
Trucks
Weights and Measures