MD SB19 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a termination provision applicable to a sales and use tax exemption for sales to specified veterans' organizations; etc.
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Veterans' Organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (126-0) | |
2012-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-03-22 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-15 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2012-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-14 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-02-10 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-10 | Floor Amendment (Senator Dyson) 633427/1 Adopted | |
2012-02-10 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-09 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing 2/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-11 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2011-09-23 | Pre-filed |