MD SB19 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the requirements an insurer must meet to be approved as a surplus lines insurer by the Maryland Insurance Commissioner; providing for the expiration of a surplus lines insurer's approval; establishing a process for renewal of a surplus lines insurer's approval; clarifying that a requirement to report specified business subject to tax and pay the tax stated in the report at specified intervals applies only to surplus lines brokers that have transacted surplus lines business in the State during the reporting period; etc.
Title
Insurance - Surplus Lines Insurers, Surplus Lines Brokers, and Reinsurers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-17 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-17 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Hearing 1/12 at 1:30 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Records
Rules and Regulations
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Records
Rules and Regulations