MD SB20 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Delegates Malone, Stein, and McMillan
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Delegates Malone, Stein, and McMillan
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the termination provision for the Chesapeake Bay Commemorative License Plate and the special registration plate honoring State agriculture to the end of June 30, 2021.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special and Commemorative Registration Plates
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Delegates Malone, Stein, and McMillan | |
2012-04-05 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-04-05 | House Refuses to Recede | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments 810011/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-12 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-13 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2012-04-01 | Senators Gladden, Forehand, and Getty | |
2012-04-01 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-04-01 | Senate Requests House Recede | |
2012-04-01 | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments | |
2012-02-10 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2012-02-08 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-08 | Favorable with Amendments 428378/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-01-06 | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-11 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-09-29 | Pre-filed |