MD SB20 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the name of the Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing to the Office of the Deaf, Hard of Hearing, and DeafBlind; changing the name of the Maryland Advisory Council on the Deaf and Hard of Hearing to the Maryland Advisory Council on the Deaf, Hard of Hearing, and DeafBlind; and making conforming changes.
Title
Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Name Change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2014-01-22 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {487470/1 Report Adopted |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/15 at 2:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Blind Persons
Committees and Commissions
Deaf Persons
Names
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Blind Persons
Committees and Commissions
Deaf Persons
Names
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials