MD SB20 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing an exception to the requirement that an appraisal management company provide certain appraisers with a certain notice and an opportunity to respond before the appraisal management company may remove an appraiser from a certain appraiser panel or refuse to assign requests for certain services.
Title
Appraisal Management Companies - Notice and Response Requirements for Violations - Repeal of Exception
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2019-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-26 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-18 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Hearing 1/10 at 1:30 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-10-25 | Senate | Pre-filed |