MD SB20 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 613
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 613
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain penalties for a person who displays a canceled, revoked, or suspended driver's license; and providing that a person who violates a certain section of the Act must appear in court and may not prepay the fine.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Canceled, Revoked, and Suspended Driver's Licenses - Penalties
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 613 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-4) |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {738876/1 Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-09-28 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB115 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 612
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Drivers' Licenses
Fines
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Drivers' Licenses
Fines
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 16 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 16 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 16 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |