MD SB235 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the State Board of Master Electricians in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2023, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the State Board; requiring the State Board to adopt regulations to establish continuing education requirements; conditioning the ability to renew a specified license on compliance with specified continuing education requirements; etc.
Title
State Board of Master Electricians - Sunset Extension and Revision
Sponsors
Sen. Education [?] | Sen. Health [?] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2011-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-22 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-15 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-04-04 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-08 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-03-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-27 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education
Electricians
Fees
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Education
Electricians
Fees
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset