MD SB235 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that specified persons shall be considered as engaging in investment activities in Iran under specified circumstances; requiring the Board of Public Works, on or before January 1, 2013, to use credible and publicly available information to create a list of persons that engage in investment activities in Iran; requiring the Board to update the list every 180 days; requiring the Board, before adding a person to the list, to provide the person with written notice that meets specified requirements; etc.
Title
Procurement - Investment Activities in Iran
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Robert Garagiola [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] |
Sen. Roger Manno [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (129-0) | |
2012-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-05 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-28 | Hearing 4/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2012-04-02 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2012-03-17 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments 874633/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-03 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-30 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing 2/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-20 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorney General
Civil Actions
Contractors
Contracts
Counties
Credit
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Energy Matters
Federal Government
Financial Institutions
Foreign Trade
International Affairs
Investments
Legislative Services, Department of
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Procurement
Public Information
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Statutes of Limitation
Attorney General
Civil Actions
Contractors
Contracts
Counties
Credit
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Energy Matters
Federal Government
Financial Institutions
Foreign Trade
International Affairs
Investments
Legislative Services, Department of
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Procurement
Public Information
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Statutes of Limitation