MD SB24 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a local department of social services to place a child for a certain initial placement with a kinship caregiver as an alternative to foster care under certain circumstances; authorizing a local department to place a child with a kinship caregiver if a kinship caregiver is located subsequent to the placement of the child in a foster care setting; specifying that a kinship caregiver may not be under 21 years of age; authorizing a local department to approve an individual as a kinship caregiver under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Family Law - Kinship Caregivers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Pre-filed |