MD SB242 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 542
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 542
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions of law authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to issue a license to feed waterfowl; repealing certain license application requirements; repealing provisions of law concerning the establishment, approval, and use of certain feeding zones; repealing a requirement that certain licensed areas be open to inspection by certain persons; repealing provisions of law authorizing the Secretary of Natural Resources to revoke a license to feed waterfowl under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Wild Waterfowl Policy - Repeal
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 542 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Agriculture
Birds
Farmland
Federal Government
Fees
Forms
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Maps and Charts
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Real Property
Reports
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
Time
Water
Weights and Measures
Birds
Farmland
Federal Government
Fees
Forms
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Maps and Charts
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Real Property
Reports
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
Time
Water
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 1001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 10 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 10 | 1003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 10 | 1004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 10 | 1005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 10 | 1006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 10 | 1007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 10 | 1008 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 10 | 1009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |