MD SB245 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing employers to grant a preference in hiring and promotion to eligible veterans, spouses of eligible veterans who have service-connected disabilities, and surviving spouses of deceased eligible veterans; providing that granting a preference under the Act does not violate State or local equal employment opportunity laws; and defining the term "eligible veteran".
Title
Labor and Employment - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans and Their Spouses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2016-04-11 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2016-04-09 | House | Delegates C. Wilson, Brooks, and S. Howard |
2016-04-09 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2016-04-09 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Senators Astle, Klausmeier, and Reilly |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-2) |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {553597/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {887577/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Disabilities
Health
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Surveyors
Veterans
Weather
Work, Labor and Employment
Disabilities
Health
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Surveyors
Veterans
Weather
Work, Labor and Employment