MD SB245 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission to the governmental activities and units subject to the Maryland Program Evaluation Act; and extending the termination date to June 30, 2035, for certain provisions of law related to the Commission.
Title
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission – Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386 |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-0) |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2024-04-05 | House | House Refuses Recede |
2024-04-05 | House | Senate Requests House Recede |
2024-04-05 | House | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2024-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {653522/1 Adopted |
2024-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-03-27 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {773927/1 Adopted |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Ethics
Health
Health Care Facilities
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Health
Standards and Best Practices
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
studies
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Ethics
Health
Health Care Facilities
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Health
Standards and Best Practices
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
studies
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2008 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2014 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Health - General | 19 | 2102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 8 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |