MD SB247 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Environment and Transportation
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Environment and Transportation
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definitions of "community association" and "local code violation" for purposes of certain provisions of law authorizing community associations to seek judicial relief for nuisance abatement in Baltimore County; repealing a provision of law requiring a certain court to determine in what amount and under what conditions a bond must be filed by a community association in a certain nuisance action; including in the definition of "community association" an association that represents two or more individual community associations; etc.
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-6) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {958970/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB511 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-14 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Baltimore County
Bonds
Boundaries
Codes
Community Development
Contracts
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Housing
Laws and Ordinances
Nonprofit Organizations
Nuisances
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Bonds
Boundaries
Codes
Community Development
Contracts
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Housing
Laws and Ordinances
Nonprofit Organizations
Nuisances
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 14 | 125 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |