MD SB248 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB438
Note: Carry Over of previous SB635
Note: Carry Over of previous SB635
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a State procurement unit to include the dollar value of its contracts with Maryland Correctional Enterprises in the total dollar value of its procurements for the purpose of calculating the unit's Minority Business Enterprise Program participation rate.
Title
Minority Business Enterprises – Calculation of Participation Rates – Procurements From Maryland Correctional Enterprises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB248 (Carry Over) 2022-01-21 - Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
SB635 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
HB450 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-28 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
SB635 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
HB450 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-28 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Data
Minorities
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Procurement
Contracts
Data
Minorities
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Procurement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0248?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0248f.pdf |