MD SB251 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-09 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-09 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing in Anne Arundel County a motorcycle dealer to sell, barter, deliver, give away, show, or offer for sale a motorcycle or a certificate of title for a motorcycle on Sunday.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Motorcycle Dealers - Sunday Operations
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-26 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2010-02-25 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-02-23 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-23 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-02-22 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-01-26 | Hearing 2/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-25 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |