MD SB256 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the scope of provisions of law that require an insurer to send to a named insured and an insurance producer a specified notice of a premium increase for policies of commercial insurance and policies of workers' compensation insurance; providing that the provisions of law do not apply to policies for which the renewal policy premium is in excess of $1,000 and an increase over the expiring policy premium of the lesser of 3% or $300; etc.
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Commercial Policies - Notices of Premium
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (130-1) | |
2012-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-05 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-03-20 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-03-13 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-24 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2012-04-02 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-22 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-02-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable with Amendments 857473/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing 2/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-25 | First Reading Finance |