MD SB266 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that an individual serving as the State Superintendent of Schools shall immediately vest in the State Retirement and Pension System.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Immediate Vesting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-33) |
2024-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2024-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 9:30 a.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2023-09-10 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB88 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 29 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |