MD SB276 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring membership in the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System for local law enforcement officers of the Frostburg City Police Department under certain circumstances; providing that an individual is entitled to eligibility service and creditable service that was earned before the effective date of the Frostburg City Police Department's participation in the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System; etc.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Frostburg City Police Department
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McKay [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2023-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-26 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-27 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 9:00 a.m. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB792 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 31 | 2A-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 31 | 2A-06 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |