MD SB278 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from engaging in a malicious course of conduct where the person intends to cause or knows or reasonably should have known that the conduct would cause serious emotional distress to another.
Title
Criminal Law - Stalking
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] | Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] | Sen. Bryan Simonaire [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2016-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-26 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {548970/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Family Law
Harassment
Minors
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Family Law
Harassment
Minors
Telecommunications and Information Technology