MD SB280 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Examiners of Landscape Architects to adopt regulations to require a licensee to demonstrate continuing professional competency as a condition of renewal of a license to practice landscape architecture by completing a specified number of hours of professional development activities; and providing for the implementation of the professional competency requirement on a phased-in basis.
Title
Landscape Architects - License Renewal - Continuing Professional Competency Requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-35) (Y: 103 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-5) (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-5) (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-35) |
2013-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-5) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:45 p.m. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Education
Job Training
Landscape Architects
Licenses
Rules and Regulations
Committees and Commissions
Education
Job Training
Landscape Architects
Licenses
Rules and Regulations