MD SB282 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-15 - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-15 - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain requirement that the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services annually report to the General Assembly about opioid use disorder among incarcerated individuals in local correctional facilities by repealing certain reporting requirements.
Title
Correctional Services - Local Detention Centers - Reporting on Opioid Use Disorder
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2023-09-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB203 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-18 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Correctional Institutions
Corrections
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Opioids
Prisoners
Public Health
Reports
Substance Abuse
Substance Abuse Treatment
Corrections
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Opioids
Prisoners
Public Health
Reports
Substance Abuse
Substance Abuse Treatment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 9 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0282?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0282f.pdf |