MD SB285 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the fee required to be assessed by the Motor Vehicle Administration against an applicant for registration of a motor vehicle who had previously been refused due to an outstanding warrant.
Title
Vehicle Registration - Fee Due to Outstanding Warrant - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2023-09-10 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB72 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-10 - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Fees
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Regulation
Warrants
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Regulation
Warrants
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 13 | 406.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |