MD SB290 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which the State may withdraw from the Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative by requiring the General Assembly to enact a law approving the withdrawal.
Title
Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Withdrawal - Legislative Approval Required (Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative Extension Act)
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-45) (Y: 90 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-3) (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-3) (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-26 | House | Third Reading Passed (89-45) |
2018-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-23 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-23 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-3) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |