MD SB291 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 816
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 816
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Human Services to take certain actions when serving as a representative payee or fiduciary for certain federal benefits for a child in the Department's custody; requiring the Department to provide certain notice to the child, through the child's attorney, of certain actions taken with respect to certain benefits for the child; etc.
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (120-15) (Y: 121 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-26 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 816 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (120-15) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Attorneys
Children
Family Law
Fiduciaries
Human Services, Department of
Juvenile Causes
Notices
Social Security
Veterans
Children
Family Law
Fiduciaries
Human Services, Department of
Juvenile Causes
Notices
Social Security
Veterans