MD SB299 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that, under specified circumstances, Montgomery County acts as a unit of the State and, for the purposes of tort claims arising out of the administration of a specified State human services program by the county, the State shall be named as the proper defendant and damages shall be limited in a specified manner; altering the definition of "tort claim"; etc.
Title
Montgomery County - Maryland Tort Claims Act - Human Services Torts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-2) (Y: 128 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482 |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-2) |
2014-04-04 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate McDonough) Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2014-03-20 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {998971/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Counties - Local Laws
Courts
Damages
Montgomery County
Notices
Social Services
Sovereign Immunity
Torts
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Counties - Local Laws
Courts
Damages
Montgomery County
Notices
Social Services
Sovereign Immunity
Torts