MD SB299 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB434
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the owners and operators of grocery stores with annual gross incomes greater than $10,000,000 or restaurants with annual gross incomes of more than $1,000,000, beginning on January 1, 2025, to place an automated external defibrillator in a prominent, accessible area and maintain the functionality of the defibrillator; requiring the Maryland Department of Health and the Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems jointly to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Title
Grocery Stores and Restaurants - Automated External Defibrillator Program (Joe Sheya Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 112 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 112 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (112-23) |
2023-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {113027/1 Adopted |
2023-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations Economic Matters |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (38-5) |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {243528/1 Adopted |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2023-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB288 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
SB434 (Carry Over) 2016-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
SB434 (Carry Over) 2016-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Emergency Medical Services
Equipment
Food
Health
Health, Department of
Medical Treatments
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Equipment
Food
Health
Health, Department of
Medical Treatments
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 13 | 517 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 21 | 330.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |