MD SB299 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the duties of the Coast Smart Council to include the development of eligibility criteria, standards, and procedures for categorical exemptions from the application of the Coast Smart requirements for proposed capital projects that have been designed to include adaptation and resiliency features to prevent or mitigate damage to the maximum extent practicable; and authorizing the Council to recommend certain regulations for adoption by the Secretary of Natural Resources.
Title
Coast Smart Council - Duties and Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-03 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-09-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Coastal Bays
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Environmental Health
Flood Control
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Shore Erosion
Standards and Best Practices
Zoning and Planning
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Environmental Health
Flood Control
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Shore Erosion
Standards and Best Practices
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 3 | 1001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 3 | 1006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |