MD SB301 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Senate Requests House Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Senate Requests House Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that the cost of the fiscal portion of
postaudit examinations of the Environmental Trust Fund be an operating cost of the Environmental Trust Fund; repealing the requirement that the cost of the fiscal portion of the audits of the 9-1-1 Trust Fund be paid from the 9-1-1 Trust Fund as an administrative cost; repealing the requirement that the cost of the fiscal portion of the postaudit examinations of the Universal Service Trust Fund be paid from the Universal Service Trust Fund as an administrative costs; etc.
Title
State Government – Office of Legislative Audits – Costs of Audits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {744565/1 Adopted |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {234837/1 Adopted |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB324 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
Discipline
Emergency Services
Environmental Matters
Environmental Trust
Examinations
Investigations and Inquiries
Legislative Services, Department of
License Commissioners, Boards of
Natural Resources
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Prince George's County
Reports
State Government - General Assembly
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
Discipline
Emergency Services
Environmental Matters
Environmental Trust
Examinations
Investigations and Inquiries
Legislative Services, Department of
License Commissioners, Boards of
Natural Resources
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Prince George's County
Reports
State Government - General Assembly
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 3 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 3A | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |