MD SB328 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of stalking to include certain conduct that occurs in person, by electronic communication, or through the use of a device that can pinpoint or track the location of another without the person's knowledge or consent.
Title
Criminal Law - Stalking - Definition
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] |
Sen. Charles Sydnor [D] | Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149 |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {263324/1 Adopted |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB148 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Electronic Communication
Electronic Surveillance
Harassment
Mobile Devices
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Electronic Communication
Electronic Surveillance
Harassment
Mobile Devices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 3 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |