MD SB33 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that certain required envelopes used by certain voters voting by absentee ballot to return their ballots include prepaid postage; requiring the State Board of Elections to reimburse each local board of elections for 50% of the costs of prepaid postage included on ballot/return envelopes or return envelopes provided to a voter voting by absentee ballot; and requiring that absentee ballots be accompanied by instructions for the postage of certain absentee ballot envelopes.
Title
Election Law - Voting by Absentee Ballot - Prepaid Postage for Return of Ballots
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-25 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-13) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/4 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 1/30 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Favorable |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 1/29 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Favorable |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB881 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-04 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Ballots
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Postal Service
Reimbursement Rates
Voting
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Postal Service
Reimbursement Rates
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 9 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |