MD SB339 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a prohibition on the issuance of a new alcoholic beverages license within and the transfer of an existing alcoholic beverages license into a specified area beginning July 1, 2015; prohibiting an existing Class A license from being transferred into specified areas beginning July 1, 2015; and authorizing the consumption of alcoholic beverages within a specified area under specified circumstances.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Baltimore City - Belvedere Square
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) |
2015-04-08 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Barkley) {653123/1 Adopted |
2015-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {943599/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-25 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {704232/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Commercial Rehabilitation
Fairs
Reports
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Commercial Rehabilitation
Fairs
Reports