MD SB34 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-30 - Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-30 - Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing the State corporate income tax rate from 8.25% to 6% for taxable years after tax year 2012.
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2012-11-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |