MD SB347 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing licensed physicians, podiatrists, and advanced practice nurses to enter into prescriber-pharmacist agreements for therapy management contracts; requiring the submission of specified documents to specified health occupations boards; requiring specified contracts to include specified provisions; providing that a protocol by a licensed physician and licensed pharmacist may authorize the initiation of specified drug therapy; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Prescriber-Pharmacist Agreements and Therapy Management Contracts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) |
2015-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {206588/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-18 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {974531/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Dentists
Diseases
Drugs
Equipment
Fees
Health Occupations
Midwives
Nurses
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Podiatrists
Records
Rules and Regulations
Contracts
Dentists
Diseases
Drugs
Equipment
Fees
Health Occupations
Midwives
Nurses
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Podiatrists
Records
Rules and Regulations