MD SB363 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-01 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-01 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a court to grant an absolute divorce on the ground of the execution of a settlement agreement that resolves issues relating to alimony and property rights care, custody and support of minor or dependent children, and all other relief authorized under the Code arising from marriage.
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce - Settlement Agreement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {228571/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Alimony
Child Care
Child Custody
Courts
Divorce
Education
Family Law
Personal Property
Real Property
Support of Dependents
Child Care
Child Custody
Courts
Divorce
Education
Family Law
Personal Property
Real Property
Support of Dependents