MD SB363 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB436
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-18 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-18 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a certain civil action to be brought against a person who knowingly summons a police officer with the intent to infringe on the person's constitutional rights, unlawfully discriminate against the person, cause the person to feel harassed or humiliated or to be expelled from a certain place, or damage a person's reputation or certain other interests; specifying certain types of damages that a certain person is entitled to recover; and providing that the Act does not restrict certain legal remedies.
Title
Courts – Improperly Summoning a Police Officer – Civil Liability
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB227 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
SB436 (Carry Over) 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
SB436 (Carry Over) 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 2201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 2202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 2203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0363?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0363f.pdf |